MO HB391 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Missouri National Guard members be treated as state employees for certain purposes
Title
Provides that Missouri National Guard members be treated as state employees for certain purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: HB 391 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 5, 12 noon or upon morning recess, whichever is later, SCR 1 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 12 noon or upon morning recess, SCR 1 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families, Veterans and Military Affairs(S) |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Insurance(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-10 | House | Prefiled (H) |