MO HB367 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes provisions regulating amateur unarmed combat competitions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions regulating amateur unarmed combat competitions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-13 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2011-02-10 Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H)
2011-01-31 Read Second Time (H)
2011-01-27 Introduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback