MO HB366 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred: Veterans(H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred: Veterans(H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends protections of federal SCRA and USERRA to the Missouri Active Guard Reserves and National Guard serving under executive order by the governor and allows all service members under certain orders to break certain contracts without penalty.
Title
Extends protections of federal SCRA and USERRA to the Missouri Active Guard Reserves and National Guard serving under executive order by the governor and allows all service members under certain orders to break certain contracts without penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB366&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1105H.01I.pdf |