MO HB345 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates August 31 of each year as "Random Acts of Kindness Day" in Missouri.
Title
Designates August 31 of each year as "Random Acts of Kindness Day" in Missouri.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McGirl [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: HB 345 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 3 |
2019-05-09 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-05-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |