MO HB341 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows certain marijuana-related offenses and violations to be expunged if the offenses or violations occurred in Missouri prior to the issuance of a patient identification card

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows certain marijuana-related offenses and violations to be expunged if the offenses or violations occurred in Missouri prior to the issuance of a patient identification card

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 341 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 341 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: HB 341 (*HA 1 HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 81 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: HB 341 (HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: HB 341 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateSecond read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2019-03-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 55 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-27HouseTaken Up
2019-03-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-25HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-03-18HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-03-13HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 2 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended, HA 2 adopted
2019-03-13HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-03-13HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-13HouseTaken Up
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-14HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-07HouseAction Postponed (H)
2019-02-07HouseExecutive Session Continued
2019-01-31HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-17HouseReferred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-19HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback