MO HB341 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that beginning January 1, 2016, certain elective county offices must file ethics reports with the Missouri Ethics Commission instead of local election authorities
Title
Specifies that beginning January 1, 2016, certain elective county offices must file ethics reports with the Missouri Ethics Commission instead of local election authorities
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - HB 341 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 13, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 157 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-01 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-01-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |