MO HB338 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 26 of each year as the "Battle of St. Louis Memorial Day."
Title
Designates May 26 of each year as the "Battle of St. Louis Memorial Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House: HB 338 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 7, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess whichever is later, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 30, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess whichever is later, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 23, 2019, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-10 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |