MO HB338 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a telecommunications company may elect to be exempt from certain rules if giving written notice to the Missouri Public Service Commission
Title
Specifies that a telecommunications company may elect to be exempt from certain rules if giving written notice to the Missouri Public Service Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-08 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-05-05 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2011-05-05 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-04 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment (S) | |
2011-03-16 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-16 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-21 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-02-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred: Utilities (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |