MO HB331 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding utilities
Title
Changes the laws regarding utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-02 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 7 |
2013-05-02 | House | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2013, 1:30p.m., Senate Lounge |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 8 |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |