MO HB33 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits medical providers from administering any medical or surgical treatment for the purpose of gender reassignment for anyone under the age of eighteen

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits medical providers from administering any medical or surgical treatment for the purpose of gender reassignment for anyone under the age of eighteen

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HouseMotion to Do Pass Failed (H)
2021-05-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-03-03HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2021-02-18HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback