MO HB317 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits all drivers, regardless of age, from text messaging while operating a moving motor vehicle on any highway in this state and prohibits anyone from being stopped solely to determine compliance
Title
Prohibits all drivers, regardless of age, from text messaging while operating a moving motor vehicle on any highway in this state and prohibits anyone from being stopped solely to determine compliance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB317&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0317I.htm |