MO HB306 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to expanding choices for educational opportunities.
Title
Relating to expanding choices for educational opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House: HB 306 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: HB 306 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: HB 306 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 26, 3:30 p.m. or upon conclusion of Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources, SCR 2 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 20, 1 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-07 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-03-29 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | HS Adopted in House (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | HS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | HS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Committed to: Legislative Review(H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 Adopted/HCS as amended pending |
2021-03-23 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 20 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |