MO HB303 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding prison canteen funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding prison canteen funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - House: HB 303 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: HB 303 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 41 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-04SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 8, 2019, 2:00pm, SCR 1
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2019-02-25HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-02-25HouseThird Read and Passed (H)
2019-02-25HouseTaken Up
2019-02-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-02-20HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-02-19HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2019-02-19HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-02-19HouseMotion to Reconsider Defeated (H)
2019-02-19HouseMotion to Reconsider - Title of HCS HB 303 was agred to be reconsidered
2019-02-19HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-19HouseTaken Up
2019-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-05HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-05HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-05HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-18HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback