MO HB3003 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATION BILL
Title
APPROPRIATION BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-06 - House - House: HB 3003 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 125 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: HB 3003 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 114 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: HB 3003 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: HB 3003 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: HB 3003 (*HA 8) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - House - House: HB 3003 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 114 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: HB 3003 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: HB 3003 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: HB 3003 (*HA 8) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2022-06-30 | House | Vetoed in Part by Governor (G) |
2022-05-18 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2022-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 27 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 27 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2022-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-05-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 8 |
2022-05-06 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 5 |
2022-05-06 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS HEGEMAN, HOUGH, LUETKEMEYER, MAY, ARTHUR |
2022-04-28 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-04-28 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SMITH(163), DEATON, BLACK(7), MERIDETH, WINDHAM |
2022-04-28 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2022-04-27 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2022-04-27 | House | House Message (H) |
2022-04-27 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference (H) |
2022-04-27 | House | Taken Up |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 25 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | SS Offered |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Friday, April 22, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 21, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 20, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 19, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 2 |
2022-04-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 6, HA 7, HA 8, HA 9, HA 11, HA 12, adopted. |
2022-04-05 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2022-04-05 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 12, adopted. |
2022-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2022-04-05 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 11, adopted. |
2022-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2022-04-05 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1, HA 6, HA 7, HA 8, HA 9, adopted. |
2022-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2022-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-04-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - with a time limit of six hours of debate on Perfection pursuant to Rule 24(4)(d). AYES: 22 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |