MO HB30 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a person to submit a specified form of photo identification in order to vote in a public election with specified exemptions
Title
Requires a person to submit a specified form of photo identification in order to vote in a public election with specified exemptions
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - HB 30 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - HB 30 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - HB 30 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 115 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - HB 30 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - HB 30 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 134 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - HB 30 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 114 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - HB 30 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - HB 30 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 115 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - HB 30 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - HB 30 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 134 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - HB 30 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 114 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 13, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-02-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2015-02-18 | House | Taken Up |
2015-02-18 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |