MO HB294 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding firearms, ammunition, and concealed carry endorsements
Title
Changes the laws regarding firearms, ammunition, and concealed carry endorsements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-08 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-13 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-05-11 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2011-05-11 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-11 | SS Withdrawn (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-04-27 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2011-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-17 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-03-16 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Laid Over (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |