MO HB29 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds all public employee retirement systems and quasi-governmental entity employee salaries to the government accountability portal
Title
Adds all public employee retirement systems and quasi-governmental entity employee salaries to the government accountability portal
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: HB 29 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA1, HA 2 adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |