MO HB2896 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an alternative remedy to remove persons who are unlawfully occupying a residential dwelling and establishes the offense of criminal mischief
Title
Establishes an alternative remedy to remove persons who are unlawfully occupying a residential dwelling and establishes the offense of criminal mischief
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Amato [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 14 NV: 28 Abs: 14) [PASS]
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-05-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 106 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 28 |
2024-05-01 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-05-01 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-04-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2024-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |