MO HB288 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the duration of unemployment compensation, modifies the method to pay federal advances, and raises the fund trigger causing contribution rate reductions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the duration of unemployment compensation, modifies the method to pay federal advances, and raises the fund trigger causing contribution rate reductions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - House: HB 288 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: HB 288 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: HB 288 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2017-04-10SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-04SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-03-24SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 9:00 a.m., SCR 1
2017-03-09SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Small Business and Industry(S)
2017-02-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-02-23HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 100 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-23HouseTaken Up
2017-02-22HousePerfected (H)
2017-02-22HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-02-22HouseMotion to Recommit - Recommit HB 288 to the Special Committee on Urban Issues. Motion DEFEATED
2017-02-22HouseTaken Up
2017-02-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2017-02-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-12HouseReferred: Special Committee on Employment Security(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-20HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback