MO HB285 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a responsive pleading must be filed in any motion to modify a child support, spousal maintenance, or child custody judgment
Title
Specifies that a responsive pleading must be filed in any motion to modify a child support, spousal maintenance, or child custody judgment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-01-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-17 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-01-17 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |