MO HB28 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Abortion-inducing Drugs Safety Act which prohibits a non-physician from prescribing an abortion-inducing drug and specifies that a pharmacy cannot be required to be connected with the drug
Title
Establishes the Abortion-inducing Drugs Safety Act which prohibits a non-physician from prescribing an abortion-inducing drug and specifies that a pharmacy cannot be required to be connected with the drug
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-04-05 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Laid Over (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-10 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |