MO HB272 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes guidelines for the regulation of occupations and professions not regulated by the Division of Professional Registration
Title
Establishes guidelines for the regulation of occupations and professions not regulated by the Division of Professional Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB272&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0916H.01I.pdf |