MO HB2710 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-25 - Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-25 - Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for certain nuclear facilities
Title
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for certain nuclear facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 20) [PASS]
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S) |
2024-04-22 | House | Read First Time (S) |
2024-04-18 | House | Delivered to the Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 9 |
2024-04-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |