MO HB2695 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a transient guest tax for general revenue purposes in Wentzville upon voter approval
Title
Authorizes a transient guest tax for general revenue purposes in Wentzville upon voter approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |