MO HB2693 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred: Select Committee on Education(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred: Select Committee on Education(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows nonpublic school students to receive reimbursement of higher education costs through the A+ schools program
Title
Allows nonpublic school students to receive reimbursement of higher education costs through the A+ schools program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2693&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2693I.PDF |