MO HB269 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for candidate filing fees payable to the secretary of state and the secretary of state's subpoena power.
Title
Modifies provisions for candidate filing fees payable to the secretary of state and the secretary of state's subpoena power.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Shaul [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 269 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 269 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 269 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 108 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 269 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 269 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 108 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 1:00pm, SCR 1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-03 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |