MO HB2604 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits animal rights charitable organizations from soliciting contributions intended for use outside the state or for political purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits animal rights charitable organizations from soliciting contributions intended for use outside the state or for political purposes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-04-21HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2016-02-23HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-02-22HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback