MO HB26 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes voter reauthorization on city earnings taxes from every five years to every 20 years
Title
Changes voter reauthorization on city earnings taxes from every five years to every 20 years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB26&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0026I.htm |