MO HB2595 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to summer camps
Title
Modifies and establishes provisions relating to summer camps
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |