MO HB2591 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "PVT Billie G Kanell Cong Medal of Honor Memorial Highway" on a portion of State Route PP in Butler County
Title
Establishes the "PVT Billie G Kanell Cong Medal of Honor Memorial Highway" on a portion of State Route PP in Butler County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 2591 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 2591 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: HB 2591 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 2591 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: HB 2591 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-24 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-05-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-14 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2016, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-29 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-16 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, and HA 5 adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |