MO HB2587 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Regulatory Sandbox Act
Title
Establishes the Regulatory Sandbox Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Riley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House: HB 2587 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: HB 2587 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: HB 2587 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 1 to SA 6, SA 6, as amended, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 11, SA 12 and SA 13. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | SS Offered |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 6, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 19, 2022, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Second read and referred: Economic Development(S) |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. |
2022-03-30 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-30 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |