MO HB2571 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Division of Finance
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Division of Finance
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Owen [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House: HB 2571 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 126 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 26, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-14 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-04-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 1 to HA 5, HA 5, as amended, adopted. |
2022-04-11 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-11 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |