MO HB257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the scope of disciplinary procedures of the board of pharmacy.
Title
Changes the scope of disciplinary procedures of the board of pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: HB 257 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 8, 2019, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S) |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-13 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-13 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |