MO HB254 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to maintenance orders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to maintenance orders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2019-04-02HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-04-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-26HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-03-26HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
2019-03-26HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-05HouseAction Postponed (H)
2019-03-05HouseExecutive Session Continued
2019-02-19HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-14HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback