MO HB2515 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to gaming
Title
Modifies provisions relating to gaming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |