MO HB2502 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SA 1, SA 1, SS, pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SA 1, SA 1, SS, pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to gaming
Title
Modifies provisions related to gaming
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Houx [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House: HB 2502 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 115 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SA 1, SA 1, SS, pending. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | SS Offered |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 25, 2022, 3:30 p.m., Senate Lounge. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 6, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HSA 1 for HA 1, HA 2, adopted. |
2022-03-23 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |