MO HB2456 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a green alert system for missing or endangered veterans.
Title
Establishes a green alert system for missing or endangered veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2456&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/6385H.01I.pdf |