MO HB2440 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Relates to the regulation of insurance
Title
Relates to the regulation of insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 |
2024-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |