MO HB2413 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to blood withdrawals by medical personnel for the purpose of determining alcohol content
Title
Modifies provisions relating to blood withdrawals by medical personnel for the purpose of determining alcohol content
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-04-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |