MO HB2412 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and modifies provisions relating to individuals found to be actually innocent through any evidentiary method
Title
Establishes and modifies provisions relating to individuals found to be actually innocent through any evidentiary method
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2022-02-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2022-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |