MO HB2412 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding weight limitations for local log trucks and log truck tractors
Title
Changes the laws regarding weight limitations for local log trucks and log truck tractors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2412&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2412I.PDF |