MO HB2402 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SCS OFFERED
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SCS OFFERED
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to promulgate regulations for the construction and renovation of hospitals which include certain standards
Title
Requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to promulgate regulations for the construction and renovation of hospitals which include certain standards
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bondon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House: HB 2402 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: HB 2402 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: HB 2402 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SCS OFFERED |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 9, 2016, 3:00 PM, Bingham Conference Room |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 21, 2016, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-29 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-29 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-16 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-16 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |