MO HB240 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds provisions relating to funding agreements in the business of insurance
Title
Adds provisions relating to funding agreements in the business of insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Insurance(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |