MO HB2397 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding federal home loan banks
Title
Changes the laws regarding federal home loan banks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House: HB 2397 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 11, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-17 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-15 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Banking(H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |