MO HB2383 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes any county treasurer and the St. Louis City treasurer to create an "Office of Financial Empowerment"
Title
Authorizes any county treasurer and the St. Louis City treasurer to create an "Office of Financial Empowerment"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |