MO HB2297 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of the Kansas City Zoological District
Title
Authorizes the establishment of the Kansas City Zoological District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 27 NAYS: 7 | |
2010-05-14 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-14 | Withdrawn (S) - MOTION TO THIRD READ AND FINALLY PASS WITHDRAWN | |
2010-05-14 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute (S) | |
2010-05-14 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1 | |
2010-05-14 | Conference Committee Substitute (S) | |
2010-05-14 | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) | |
2010-05-13 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 21 | |
2010-05-13 | House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute (H) | |
2010-05-13 | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 19 | |
2010-05-12 | Conference Committee Substitute (H) | |
2010-05-12 | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2010-05-11 | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES ZERR, NOLTE, WALLACE, HUMMEL AND LEVOTA | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS WILSON, KEAVENY, SHIELDS, PEARCE AND VOGEL | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) | |
2010-05-05 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2010-04-27 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-27 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 23 NAYS: 6 | |
2010-04-27 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-22 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-15 | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2010-04-06 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Perfected (H) | |
2010-03-31 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-30 | Objection Filed. Removed from Consent Calendar - Rule 45(b) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-18 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-18 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Tourism (H) | |
2010-03-15 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |