MO HB2213 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 66 NOES: 67 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 66 NOES: 67 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Compassionate Care Act regarding the licensure of medical cannabis centers and cultivation and prodiction facilities to provide medical cannabis to qualifying patients
Title
Establishes the Missouri Compassionate Care Act regarding the licensure of medical cannabis centers and cultivation and prodiction facilities to provide medical cannabis to qualifying patients
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: HB 2213 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - House: HB 2213 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 91 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: HB 2213 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 87 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: HB 2213 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 91 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House: HB 2213 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 87 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 66 NOES: 67 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, and HA 4 adopted |
2016-04-19 | House | HCS Adopted (H) - AYES: 91 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-19 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |