MO HB2212 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds emergency medical technicians, firefighters, and first responders to the list of mandated reporters of elder abuse
Title
Adds emergency medical technicians, firefighters, and first responders to the list of mandated reporters of elder abuse
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House: HB 2212 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 12, 2016, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-01 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2016-03-01 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |