MO HB2202 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to computer science courses offered in elementary and secondary schools
Title
Modifies provisions related to computer science courses offered in elementary and secondary schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House: HB 2202 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: HB 2202 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: HB 2202 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 9, 2022, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 12, 2022, 10:00 a.m or upon conclusion of Economic Development (whichever is later), Senate Lounge. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-03-21 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |