MO HB2194 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


Modifies provisions relating to criminal records

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Modifies provisions relating to criminal records



2018-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
2018-03-15HouseTaken Up
2018-03-12HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
2018-03-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-27HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-31HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-01-23HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-22HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

Bill Comments